Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of New York

  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00012-1
    Party Name:USA v. Salisbury
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Pretrial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.nynd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105962
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =