Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management(2nd)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Hearing Held (Other)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Court Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Show Cause for Failure to Meet Credit Counseling Requirements]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Update Ch 7. Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [B121 Received by Clerk's Office]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-11730-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Danaher-Trustee, Philip J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Order Closing Dismissed]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management(2nd)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Adjourned Chapter 12/13 341 Meeting and Confirmation Hearing (batch)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:February 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Trustee's Default Motion to Dismiss Case (AC)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Update Ch 13 Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Update Ch 13 Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [B121 Received by Clerk's Office]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [B121 Received by Clerk's Office]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1-rel
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:17-10044-1
    Party Name:Mark Holmes
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.nynb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?361670

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 2 =