Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-24472-rdd
    Party Name:Lilliana Saljanin
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-24472-rdd
    Party Name:Lilliana Saljanin
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Discharge of Debtor (BNC)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-24472-rdd
    Party Name:Lilliana Saljanin
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Financial Management Course Certification (Official Form 423)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-24472-rdd
    Party Name:Lilliana Saljanin
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Report of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-24472-rdd
    Party Name:Lilliana Saljanin
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Requirement to Complete RFEOD and DSO (batch)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.nysb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?223213

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 1 =