Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:18-cv-10767
    Party Name:Antolini v. Christopher & Seventh Realty LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediator Session Held]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Mediator Assignment]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaints]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediation Referral Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:November 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 17, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?504985
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =