Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00006-1
    Party Name:USA v. Bazemore
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Letter Motion]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Unseal Indictment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?507881
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =