open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00336-FB
    Party Name:USA v. Sledge
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Summons]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report of Offender Under Supervision]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?419310
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =