Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00011-1
    Party Name:USA v. Sinkfield
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Letter Motion]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum to the Docket Clerk]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter Motion]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Conference]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?508061
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =