Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:8-19-70284-reg
    Party Name:Eric J. Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Held and Closed]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Confirmation]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors and Hearing on Confirmation Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 13) (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Chapter 13 Plan with Petition]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan with Petition]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?464792
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =