Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:19-30022-5-mcr
    Party Name:River Meadows, LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Notice of Hearing on Default Motion]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to the Restriction and Redaction]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Transcript]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Transcript Request Processed]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Request for Transcript]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Response]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Order]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Objection]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Reply]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [341Meeting of Creditors Closed.]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Letter of Adjournment]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Consent]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Employ]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Leberman-Trustee, William J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nynb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?373441
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =