Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00338
    Party Name:Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. et al v. Pinkerton Consulting & Investigations, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?508224
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =