Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01268
    Party Name:Teresi v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Order re Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?509861
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =