Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01267
    Party Name:Miller v. Bloomingdale Road Judgment Recovery et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Counsel]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?509860
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =