open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01269
    Party Name:Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Seaspan Corp.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conference]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Consent Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Endorsed Letter]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?509862
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =