Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:19-10422-jlg
    Party Name:Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice, Appearance]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Add Claims and Noticing Agent]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Case Association - Joint Administration]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application, Extend Time to File Schedules]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto - docket of credit card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion, Joint Administration]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290335
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =