open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:8-19-72754-las
    Party Name:Mark A. Thom
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Relief from Stay (Fee Due)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Certificate of Debtor Education or Offical Form 423 Certification About a Financial Mgmt Course]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds Collected]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 No Asset) (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Thaler, Andrew M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?469405
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =