open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:19-10686-1-rel
    Party Name:Sondra E. Birch
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Response]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Trustee's Default Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (AC)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Hearing Continued (Other)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Order Granting Request for Loss Mitigation]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Hearing Set (Objection to Chapter 13 Plan)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management(2nd)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Loss Mitigation Request by Debtor and Certification of Service]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Time for Filing Objections To and the Hearing to Consider Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Hearing Set(Motion)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Objection]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Deduction Order]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Certification Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 3015-1]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certification Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 3015-1]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Payment Advice Statements]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advice Statements]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Rights and Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtors and Their Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Rights and Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtors and Their Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [none]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Celli-Trustee, Andrea E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nynb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?375068
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =