open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03360
    Party Name:Park West Galleries, Inc. v. ALP, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?513767
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =