open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02872-MKB
    Party Name:Jayanti v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433306
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =