open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02871-FB-LB
    Party Name:Carter v. Verizon Communications Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433305
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =