open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of New York
    Case Number:19-31114-5-mcr
    Party Name:Michael D Gregory
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management(2nd)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Chapter 12/13 341Meeting of Creditors Closed.(batch)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Deduction Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Certification Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 3015-1]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Payment Advice Statements]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advice Statements]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (pre-petition)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Swimelar-Trustee, Mark W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Attorney Use]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nynb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377163
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =