open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-08098
    Party Name:Jia v. Wang
  • Filing Type:Civil [Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out - District Transfer]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?520983
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =