open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-06708-EK-LB
    Party Name:Ducan El Bai v. Supreme Court State of New York Queens County et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442186
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =