open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-06704-PKC-JO
    Party Name:Scott Bey et al v. Supreme Court State of New York, County of Queens et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice(Other)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442184
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =