open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-11230
    Party Name:Lee v. Moncler USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:December 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?527950
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =