Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Counsel]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to PSI]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing ]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order ]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - Temporary]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [1Fox Case Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued ]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Penalty Sheet]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Requested]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Unredacted Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:17-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:USA v. Rivera-Moreno
    Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment ]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?154883

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 3 =