Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Trustee Report of Filed Claims]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Order on Trustee's Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Tranfer of Claims]
    Date Published:September 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Transfer of Claim and Notice of Transfer (no waiver)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Objection to Claim (13-15a)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Notice and Proposed Order of Confirmation]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Restraining Notice]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [13 Restraining Notice]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [13 - Chapter 13 Notice to Creditors and Proposed Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [13 Application for Base Fee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [13 - Chapter 13 Notice to Creditors and Proposed Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [13 Application for Base Fee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10023
    Party Name:Larry Wayne Davis and Joann Jeffries Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?202309

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 3 =