Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Final Decree]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Final Decree - Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Post New Law]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Statement of No Presumption of Abuse (batch)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-10022
    Party Name:Joshua Brett Kalill
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?202308

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 3 =