Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Final Decree]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Final Decree - Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:June 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Post New Law]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Notice of Abandonment]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Proposed Document]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Abandon]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Statement of No Presumption of Abuse (batch)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50027
    Party Name:Grant Edward Hurrell
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?202305

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 1 =