Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00002-1
    Party Name:USA v. GRABAREK
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Referred to Judge]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appearance Bond]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Factual Basis Document]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?80903
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =