Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00008
    Party Name:Cross et al v. Formativ Health Management, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Referred to Clerk]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Selected for Mediation]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency - Filing is not text searchable]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Special Appearance]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?168807
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =