Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:19-10035
    Party Name:Linda Carol Strider
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Final Decree]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Final Decree - Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:May 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Post New Law]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Statement of No Presumption of Abuse (batch)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Saslow, Everett B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210145
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =