Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:19-80023
    Party Name:Ronald Bowling
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments and Notice of Hearing (13-15)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Notice of Plan and Time for Filing Objection]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Notice (Generic) (with BNC option)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Amended Exempt Property Claim]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Certificate of Financial Management Course (batch)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued - Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Supplement to Affidavit of Service - Certified Mail Receipt]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Restraining Notice]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [13 Restraining Notice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [13 - Chapter 13 Notice to Creditors and Proposed Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [13 Application for Base Fee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [13 - Chapter 13 Notice to Creditors and Proposed Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [13 Application for Base Fee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hutson, Richard M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210144
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =