open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00025-1
    Party Name:USA v. Cyr
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Submitted]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document ]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Referred]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order ]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - Temporary]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nced.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?169039
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =