open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:19-10155
    Party Name:Barbara Lee Kelley-Mathis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Hearing Held (Motion)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Notice of Plan and Time for Filing Objection]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Installment Payment - Final]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Hearing Continued (Motion) - Trustee Motion Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Meeting of Creditors Continued - Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Motion to Dismiss Case and Notice of Hearing (13-15)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [none]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Installment Payment]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Restraining Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Notice of Deficiency of Service (Generic)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [13 Restraining Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [13 - Chapter 13 Notice to Creditors and Proposed Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Troxler, Anita Jo Kinlaw [13 Application for Base Fee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [13 - Chapter 13 Notice to Creditors and Proposed Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [13 Application for Base Fee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210451
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =