open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00061
    Party Name:Keller v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96077
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =