open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00587
    Party Name:MCCOLLUM V. UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties RE: SO30]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Standing Order 30]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Mediation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Right to Consent]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1a]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?82602
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =