Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00062
    Party Name:NIBCO Inc. v. Lebanon City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Deposition]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 30, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?179739
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =