open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:16-cv-00845
    Party Name:Mahdy et al v. Mason City School District Board of Education et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order setting Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?196033
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =