Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Chapter 13 Trustee's Certification in a Converted/Dismissed/Ineligible Case]
    Date Published:March 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Dismiss Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Dismiss Debtor(s)/Case]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Meeting of Creditors and/or Confirmation Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Payroll Deduction Order]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Transmission of Document to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burks, Margaret A [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10079
    Party Name:Cynthia Renee White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741470

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 1 =