Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Abandonment]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Notice to File Proof of Claim]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Spaeth, Paul [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30075
    Party Name:Jeremy A. Heimer
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741467

Post Your Comment or Question

4 x 2 =