open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:19-10175-aih
    Party Name:Saneyah Nudar Shabazz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Notice of Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor for Judge Harris]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Notice to File Claim]
    Date Published:March 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [ADI BNC Notice of Assets and Request for Notice to Creditors]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Notice of Assets & Request for Notice to Creditors]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Notice of Order on Motion to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [ADI List of Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coniglio, Kari B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1049838
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =