open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:19-bk-50189
    Party Name:George D Hunt and Penny J Hunt
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Amended Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Continuing Hearing (BK Other)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - Prior to Confirmation]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Payroll Deduction Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:January 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pees, Frank M [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?775845
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =