open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00316-JGC
    Party Name:Dominique v. A.P.I., Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion ]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for extension of time to answer]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension (answer complaint)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?251343
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =