Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:19-bk-50745
    Party Name:Garland E. Fletcher
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Certificate of Service of Tax Information]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McClatchey, Larry J [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?777010
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =