open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00152-1
    Party Name:USA v. Lipsey
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment ]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?228103
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =