open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:19-51611-amk
    Party Name:Kiara S. Williamson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Show Cause - (PDF)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [ADI Receipt of Second Installment Payment Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [ADI Receipt of First Installment Payment Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Notice of Order on Motion to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Belfance, Trustee Kathryn A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1060420
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =