open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:19-bk-54523
    Party Name:Amber N. Stanley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Amended Document]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bowers, Brenda K. [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?784951
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =