open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:19-bk-12559
    Party Name:Janet Burge
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [RETIRED-Judge Hopkins Reassignment (Court Use Only)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Update 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Notice]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?784950
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =