open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:19-33910-jpg
    Party Name:Tammy Sue Clark
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Case Closed Group 310]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Notice of Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Automatic Discharge of Debtor for Judge Gustafson]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1068777
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =