Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Final Decree. Case Closed.]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor - BNC or USPS Undeliverable Notice]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Financial Management ADI Only]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Payment Advices Certification]
    Date Published:January 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122A-1/Exemption Presumption of Abuse - Form 122A-1Supp]
    Date Published:January 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [14 Day Incomplete Filing - Payment Advices]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [14 Day Means Test Incomplete Filing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10028-R
    Party Name:Cynthia Lynn Johnson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swinson, Sidney K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.oknb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?142304

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 1 =